Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF SOUTH MANCHESTER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1048916
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time