Financial history UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF SOUTH MANCHESTER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1048916
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £1.85m £1.35m £1.07m £1.38m £1.12m
Total expenditure £2.03m £1.77m £1.97m £1.42m £1.65m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £996.00k £668.00k £883.00k £831.00k
Income - Other trading activities £74.00k £141.00k £75.00k £80.00k £104.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £205.00k £209.00k £208.00k £188.00k £181.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £123.00k £225.00k £0
Income - Legacies £513.00k £300.00k £69.00k £252.00k £98.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £1.69m £1.88m £1.35m £1.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.00k
Expenditure - Governance £44.00k £42.00k £41.00k £42.00k £43.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £29.00k £28.00k £32.00k £35.00k £35.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0