NORTH EAST JEWISH COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The North East Jewish Community Services aims to offer assistance to those persons of the Jewish faith who reside in the North East of England. There is a community worker available who will assess need, liaise with both the statutory/voluntary sector of social services and ensure that a package of assistance is individually catered to.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 September 1995: Standard registration
- JEWISH CARE NORTH EAST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernice Marcus | Chair | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Raymond Goldsmith | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sylvia Rowlands | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Heather Gould | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
HOWARD GOLD | Trustee | 07 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||
PETER ALLAN MICKLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BARRY NEIL SPEKER OBE DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.61k | £5.54k | £3.29k | £3.10k | £4.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.15k | £5.75k | £3.81k | £7.31k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 1995 AND CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9TH DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH (WHEREVER RESIDENT BUT IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE RESIDING IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND) WHO ARE IN NEED OR SUFFER VISUAL OR OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL IMPAIRMENT RESULTING IN DISABILITY OR HANDICAP
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lionel Jacobsen House
Culzean Park
Graham Park Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE3 4BH
- Phone:
- 01912851968
- Email:
- petermickler10@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window