Financial history Rowheath Pavilion Church

Charity number: 1048946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £109.13k £130.05k £119.79k £151.19k £124.13k
Total expenditure £107.13k £112.49k £124.92k £113.39k £122.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.96k N/A N/A