Financial history FRIENDS OF LEIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.14k £2.02k £1.46k £2.12k £2.55k
Total expenditure £10.36k £1.67k £2.02k £2.84k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A