Financial history BEARWOOD CHAPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1049009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £86.72k £68.30k £41.88k £42.42k £44.34k
Total expenditure £82.96k £76.27k £43.99k £34.67k £62.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A