BENEDICTINE NUNS OF CURZON PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object is the advancement of religion, especially Roman Catholic faith. The trustees primarily achieve this through maintenance & support of a community of Nuns resident at Curzon Park. In addition the charity is engaged in prayers, almsgiving & hospitality. Regular donations are made on a monthly basis to other charities. Financial assistance is also given to individuals in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 06 September 1995: Standard registration
- BENEDICTINE ABBEY CURZON PARK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Michelle Ruth Maurer | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAME CLARE COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAME CHRISTOPHER GODDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.48k | £83.35k | £58.14k | £30.74k | £34.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.10k | £127.62k | £150.10k | £138.39k | £150.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE BENEDICTINE ABBEY CURZON PARK CHESTER OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Curzon Park South
Chester
CH4 8AB
- Phone:
- 01244671323
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window