WINSTANLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Charity number: 1049056
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fund raising i.e. sponsored events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 September 2014
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Leicestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 September 1995: Standard registration
- 07 August 2015: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- WINSTANLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE - SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- WINSTANLEY HIGH SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 18/09/2013 | 18/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £913 | £815 | £207 | £133 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £608 | £268 | £296 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 September 2014 | 17 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 September 2013 | 22 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 25 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 07 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window