Financial history THE NO WAY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1049059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £395.60k £409.62k £517.16k £548.83k £545.34k
Total expenditure £410.45k £405.27k £494.94k £553.08k £542.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.70k £126.58k £32.02k N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £194.53k £189.25k £192.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £322.64k £359.58k £352.40k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £225
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £487.79k £545.63k £532.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £7.14k £7.46k £9.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £13.53k £16.08k £16.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0