Trustees WYTHENSHAWE HOSPITAL TRANSPLANT FUND
Charity number: 1049067

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Nuttall | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wood | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Callan | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mather | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Fowler | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Eadie | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM NOBLE | Trustee | 12 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.