FRIENDS OF GRAYSHOTT SURGERY (FROGS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertake fund raising activities, receive donations and purchase equipment for the surgery of benefit to patients of the surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 November 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 September 1995: Standard registration
- 27 October 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- F R O G S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/11/2010 | 15/11/2011 | 15/11/2012 | 15/11/2013 | 15/11/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £4.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £199 | £129 | £1.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2014 | 30 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2013 | 27 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 November 2012 | 27 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 27TH JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNES AMONGST PEOPLE IN HINDHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR SURGERY NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
GRAYSHOTT, HINDHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window