Financial history CHARLOTTE BEATY'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1049099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.38k £23.59k £23.67k £24.38k £30.96k
Total expenditure £7.81k £2.08k £19.07k £13.85k £30.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A