Financial history THE NORTHUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1049106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £92.21k £42.82k £66.42k £62.74k £69.86k
Total expenditure £101.15k £63.78k £87.75k £76.12k £71.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A