Trustees THE NORTHUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1049106

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARJORIE READ | Chair | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Jarvis | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dee Ward | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Kim Suleman | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Robinson | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA KILKENNY | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Pamela Lamb | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Douglas | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moira Bengston | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judy Woodsford | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Coleman | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MCLEAN | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.