Grace Church, Bolton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Related Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bolton
- Lancashire
- Zambia
Governance
- 13 September 1995: Standard registration
- BOLTON FAMILY CHURCH (Previous name)
- GRACE CHURCH BOLTON (Previous name)
- KINGS CHURCH BOLTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jospeh Hoaghton | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Jane Prout | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rajitha Edirisinghe | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Spielmann | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Taylor | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JAMES MCGREGOR | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|||||
STEPHANIE BRADBROOK | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.81k | £255.81k | £377.30k | £320.15k | £368.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.30k | £205.30k | £247.65k | £308.49k | £350.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.74k | £880 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 APRIL 1995 as amended on 24 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2. TO ASSIST AGED PERSONS AND PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Grace Centre
Somerset Road
Bolton
BL1 4NE
- Phone:
- 07739157730
- Email:
- office@gracecentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window