FRIENDS OF NEWENT COMMUNITY SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1049148
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING TO SUPPORT GOVERNERS, STUDENTS AND STAFF OF NEWENT COMMUNITY SCHOOL IN EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income: £173
Total expenditure: £3,475
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Gloucestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 September 1995: Standard registration
- 27 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE FRIENDS OF NEWENT COMMUNITY SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £467 | £32.78k | £1.00k | £2.51k | £173 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.21k | £1.79k | £2.26k | £3.47k | £3.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 18 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 13 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window