ANTI-SLAVERY INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anti-Slavery International works to eliminate all forms of slavery throughout the world by investigating and exposing current cases of slavery, campaigning for its eradication, supporting the initiatives of local organisations to secure the freedom of those in slavery or vulnerable to it, and pressing for more effective implementation of national and international laws against slavery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,010,744
Donations and legacies | £1.57m | |
Charitable activities | £2.79m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £9.25k | |
Other | £643.80k |
Total expenditure:
£4,421,037
Raising funds | £618.39k | |
Charitable activities | £3.80m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £333,619 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £618.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.80m | |
Retained for future use | £589.71k |
People

38 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Ghana
- Mauritania
- Niger
- Tanzania
Governance
- 13 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Pranlal Sheth | Chair | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dalton | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Judith Anne Lister | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Soumya Singh | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Malcolm Lowthian Freedman | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Rawlings | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Scaria Palakudiyil | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.66m | £3.17m | £3.47m | £3.90m | £5.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88m | £2.94m | £3.29m | £3.79m | £4.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £729.18k | £1.44m | £264.69k | £84.92k | £333.62k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £984.96k | £739.77k | £592.03k | £1.39m | £1.57m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £38.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.62m | £2.38m | £2.84m | £2.41m | £2.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £55.51k | £4.77k | £46.98k | £101.91k | £9.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £643.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £428.99k | £102.26k | £33.97k | £300.06k | £384.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.48m | £2.50m | £2.78m | £3.12m | £3.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £396.05k | £439.68k | £511.69k | £670.33k | £618.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.55k | £15.40k | £28.35k | £34.43k | £34.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.06m | £958.32k | £996.93k | £956.86k | £1.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £654.02k | £640.55k | £646.91k | £630.30k | £15.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £753.31k | £880.74k | £972.28k | £1.23m | £2.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £622.61k | £507.39k | £418.29k | £555.48k | £311.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 14TH JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 3RD DECEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE ELIMINATION OF SLAVERY,THE SLAVE TRADE AND ALL FORMS OF UNLAWFUL FORCED LABOUR AND UNLAWFUL DEPRIVATION OF FREEDOM AS FROM TIME TO TIME MENTIONED IN THE SLAVERY CONVENTION OF 1926,THE SUPPLEMENTARY CONVENTION ON THE ABOLITION OF SLAVERY,THE SLAVE TRADE AND INSTITUTIONS AND PRACTICES SIMILAR TO SLAVERY OF 1956 AND ANY OTHER INTERNATIONAL TREATIES CONVENTIONS OR CONVENANTS PREPARED AND EXECUTED OR SIGNED UNDER THE AUSPICES OF THE UNITED NATIONS;AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING THE RIGHTS OF INDIGENOUS PEOPLES;AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET FORTH IN THE UNITED NATIONS UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS OF 1948 AND CONCERNING HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
17 Oval Way
LONDON
SE11 5RR
- Phone:
- 02075018920
- Email:
- info@antislavery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window