THE GEOFFREY PARSONS MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the charity are to provide financial assistance for the benefit of persons who are either concert pianists who have a particular interest in the accompaniment of song or chamber music, or for such charitable objects related to music or otherwise as the Trustees think fit. Unsolicited applications will not be considered by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 1995: Standard registration
- 03 January 2013: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.52k | £3.74k | £2.62k | £6.13k | £3.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £7.59k | £1.73k | £3.56k | £61.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 30 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 15 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 19 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 05 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 20 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
(A) IN PROVIDING BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (WHETHER THROUGH GRANTS BURSARIES SCHOLARSHIPS PRIZES AWARDS OR IN ANY OTHER WAY) TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO (I) ARE CONCERT PIANISTS OR IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES (FORMED IN THE LIGHT OF SUCH ADVICE (IF ANY) AS THEY SEE FIT TO OBTAIN) HAVE THE ABILITY TO BECOME CONCERT PIANISTS AND (II) HAVE A PARTICULAR INTEREST IN THE ACCOMPANIMENT OF SONG OR IN CHAMBER MUSIC AND WISH TO PURSUE A CAREER IN OR PARTLY IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THOSE FIELDS AS MAY BE CALCULATED TO HELP THEM TOWARDS THE FULFILMENT OF THAT WISH. (B) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS RELATED TO MUSIC AS THEY THINK FIT. (C) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THEY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window