THE LINKAGE GROUP

Charity number: 1049174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting adults with Learning Disabilities. Organising social activities, operation of a weekly drop in club. Fundraising towards provision of residential facility.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £5,224
Total expenditure: £4,928

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID EDWIN WALL Trustee
DOLPHIN SWIMMING CLUB FOR HANDICAPPED PERSONS
Received: On time
CEDRIC ANDREW RAY Trustee
None on record
PAUL CASPAR JUON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £830 £2.02k £1.22k £5.22k
Total expenditure £1.55k £182 £288 £977 £4.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 HORN HILL
WHITWELL
HITCHIN
SG4 8AS
Phone:
01438871479
Website:

No information available