Financial history SELATTYN C E SCHOOL P T A

Charity number: 1049182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £3.52k £2.33k £0 £0 £2.76k
Total expenditure £5.54k £1.43k £3.66k £545 £265
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A