Financial history HOME COUNTIES NORTH ADVANCED DRIVERS GROUP

Charity number: 1049210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £9.26k £5.99k £7.21k £7.69k £6.91k
Total expenditure £10.24k £6.98k £7.62k £8.95k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A