Accounts and annual returns BROMLEY HOSPITALS NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1049222
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 26 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 28 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 April 2009 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 17 April 2009 76 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 13 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 19 June 2008 140 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 25 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time