Accounts and annual returns PARKLAND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1049233
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 11 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 20 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required