Financial history PARKLAND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1049233
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £3.26k £3.00k £2.95k £2.77k £2.24k
Total expenditure £2.25k £2.15k £1.74k £5.39k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A