THE LARCHES TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a stimulating Day Opportunities Programme, including education, training and work opportunities in preparation for employment. To develop a vibrant and recreation programme. To provide Supported Living where everyone feels they belong.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 September 1995: Standard registration
- THE LARCHES COMMUNITY (Working name)
- THE LARCHES TRUST OR THE LARCHES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Brooks | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sasha-Clair Holyoke | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.14k | £79.64k | £68.59k | £48.18k | £50.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.51k | £78.90k | £67.55k | £60.83k | £77.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ADULTS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF THE JEWISH FAITH) BY THE MANAGEMENT OF SUITABLE ACCOMODATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RECREATION FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 RECTORY LANE
EDGWARE
HA8 7LF
- Phone:
- 02089056333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window