FRIENDS OF OAKRIDGE INFANT SCHOOL
Charity number: 1049244
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for our local infant school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Total income: £8,065
Total expenditure: £16,305
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Hampshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 September 1995: Standard registration
- 13 November 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £6.86k | £9.03k | £13.76k | £8.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £5.59k | £10.32k | £9.92k | £16.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 29 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 30 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF OAKRIDGE INFANT SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE CATCHMENT AREA OF OAKRIDGE INFANT SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window