MARCHWOOD VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide suitable premises for local people to hire at an affordable rate. To provide activities for local people to enjoy i.e Monthly Tea Dances - Weekly Pre School Activity Sessions - Toddler Group for Pre School Children - 50 + Club for Older Local Residents. We also accomodate local groups i.e. Kung Fu Club - Women's Institute - Computer Classes - Parish Council Meetings - Brass Band etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,698 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 September 1995: Standard registration
- M C A (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Bennett | Chair | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA WALKER | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEVE DALY | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE GOULDING | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TONY HODDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
DARRYL HINDLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DEE PERKIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SAXBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.22k | £39.15k | £44.95k | £55.37k | £51.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.09k | £30.60k | £43.48k | £51.73k | £43.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £34.63k | £16.24k | N/A | £9.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE LEASE OF MARCHWOOD VILLAGE HALL ON TRUST FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MARCHWOOD PARISH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS TO INCLUDE USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR ALL OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE INTENT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MARCHWOOD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MARCHWOOD PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
MCA
VILLAGE HALL
VILLAGE CENTRE
MARCHWOOD
HANTS
SO40 4SX
- Phone:
- 02380667927
- Email:
- marchwoodvh@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window