STANBRIDGE LOWER SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1049285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Summer Fayre on school grounds Fun afternoons for children in school hall Various craft activities BBQ for families Discos for children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £2,036
Total expenditure: £4,255

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kayleigh Ng Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Polly Baker Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £443 £1.45k £578 £2.23k £2.04k
Total expenditure £2.09k £1.56k £1.49k £390 £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2021 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stanbridge Lower School
Tilsworth Road
Stanbridge
Leighton Buzzard
LU7 9HY
Phone:
01525384414
Website:

No information available