THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S MAIN ACTIVITIES CONSIST OF SUMMER, EASTER AND CHRISTMAS FAYRES, REFRESHMENT EVENTS, SELLING CHILDREN'S ART ITEMS, ETC AIMED AT RAISING FUNDS IN SUPPORT OF ST MARY'S PRIMARY SCHOOL IN FOWNHOPE AND ENCOURAGING A POSITIVE SCHOOL COMMUNITY AND SCHOOL BONDING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 20 September 1995: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- ST MARYS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN NAPPER | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE KNIGHT | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64k | £9.87k | £3.50k | £8.35k | £8.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.34k | £1.83k | £6.11k | £5.27k | £8.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1994, AS AMENDED 11 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2014 as amended on 30 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL AND FOWNHOPE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, ST.MARY'S PRIMARY SCHOOL FOWNHOPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary's C of E School
Fownhope
HEREFORD
HR1 4PG
- Phone:
- 01432860474
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window