Trustees CROYDON YOUTH INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING SERVICE LIMITED
Charity number: 1049307

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger King | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Portia Kumalo | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald Boswell | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhianne Danielle Elleston Pascall | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Basil Morris | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL KEEHAN | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.