WINDSOR THEATRE DESCRIBERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides audio description of productions at the Theatre Royal, Windsor and enables visual impaired children to attend the pantomime by paying for seats for them and their teachers/carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Buckinghamshire
- Surrey
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 21 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Cox | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILKS | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BETTY WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY NOAKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN UZZELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69 | £11 | £0 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £216 | £86 | £650 | £205 | £190 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENT ATTENDING PRODUCTIONS AT THE THEATRE ROYAL WINDSOR IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN AUDIO DESCRIPTION SERVICE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, BERKSHIRE, SOUTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, NORTH SURREY, NORTH HAMPSHIRE AND WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREE TOPS
TITE HILL
ENGLEFIELD GREEN
EGHAM
TW20 0NJ
- Phone:
- 01784477112
- Email:
- regishart@gmail.com
- Website:
-
windsortheatredescribers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window