Financial history ELITE SUPPORTED EMPLOYMENT AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 1049341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.61m £2.24m £3.27m £3.17m £2.61m
Total expenditure £2.51m £2.20m £2.65m £3.39m £3.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £474.85k £373.35k
Income from government grants £175.14k £133.67k £248.64k £64.76k £60.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.00k
Income - Other trading activities £771.11k £643.43k £950.95k £701.77k £826.28k
Income - Charitable activities £1.82m £1.58m £2.31m £2.42m £1.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.65k £14.27k £14.04k £51.29k £86.27k
Income - Other £0 £3.30k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.51m £2.20m £2.65m £3.39m £3.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.50k
Expenditure - Governance £9.02k £9.65k £8.42k £63.17k £49.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £122.59k £46.76k £197.93k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £974 £0