Financial history NORFOLK GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity Number: 1049349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.44k £4.69k £3.95k £6.61k £7.01k
Total expenditure £4.17k £2.81k £5.12k £8.47k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A