THE J P MARLAND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make donations to charitable institutions or individuals which are considered by the trustees to be worthy causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1995: Standard registration
- J P MARLAND CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Hon The Lord Jonathan Peter Marland of Odstock | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGO MARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL JULIE LAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARCUS MARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.51k | £46.94k | £42.96k | £31.86k | £47.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.02k | £134.93k | £47.26k | £41.37k | £73.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Belgrave Road
London
SW1V 2BJ
- Phone:
- 02077 520177
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window