BRANDON SENIORS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide:- Transport to and from local Church Hall. Midday meal -assistance is provided to obtain grocery shoping. Day trips and outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1995: Standard registration
- THE BRANDON HANDICAPPED CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Walkerdine | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nina Walkerdine | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Sands | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA NELSON | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RITA WINWRIGHT | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jacquline Challiss | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
ANN BETTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.91k | £4.82k | £1.40k | £6.46k | £9.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.58k | £4.86k | £1.87k | £7.94k | £9.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH NOVEMBER 1994(AS AMENDED ON 10TH JULY 1995) AND 25 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED AND ELDERLY PEOPLE LIVING IN BRANDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ON ONE DAY PER WEEK AND AT SUCH OTHER TIMES AS THE CLUB MAY DECIDE FACILITIES, ITEMS AND ACTIVITIES SO AS TO RELIEVE SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
BRANDON COMMUNITY CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 BRACKEN RISE
BRANDON
IP27 0SX
- Phone:
- 01842810186
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window