Financial history KASHMIRI CHILDREN'S WELFARE TRUST

Charity Number: 1049393
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £10.48k £10.16k £11.72k £10.86k £11.00k
Total expenditure £11.00k £6.00k £14.00k £13.05k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A