2ND WALTHAMSTOW SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Royal Navy approved Sea Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 27 September 1995: Standard registration
- 15 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 2ND WALTHAMSTON SEA SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.47k | £3.50k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.91k | £5.25k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 15 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
POLICY ORGANISATION AND RULES 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AND AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS, AS MENBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window