ASIAN MOTHER AND CHILD GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Group is designed for lonely, isolate and refugee women. Organising talks, cultural activities, classes and demonstrations run various workshops Monday afternoon school term time mother and toddler group for under 5 between 1:pm to 3:pm with the help of 3 cr+¿che workers, up stair we have on going activity lunch club once a month and etc...
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 28 September 1995: Standard registration
- 10 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.71k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £5.20k | £4.80k | £5.00k | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 01 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 11 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOLO AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THER NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH THE GROUP AND BY: (A)OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES TOGETHER WITH THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH A GROUP; (B)ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE AREA. 2.TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF MOTHERS AND WOMEN IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window