INVICTA ADVOCACY NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Mental Health Advocacy (adults) in Dartford, Gravesham, Swanley IMHA Service for Dartford, Gravesham,Swanley IMHA Service in Secure Settings Kent and Medway funded patients (and up to 150 miles away) Independent Dementia Advocacy across West Kent IMCA Services West Kent and Medway Care Act Services West Kent. Two service user forums (one BME) . Patients Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £43,307 from government contract(s) and £273,407 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 27 September 1995: Standard registration
- 30 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DARTFORD AND GRAVESHAM ADVOCACY NETWORK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.58k | £268.57k | £279.59k | £325.91k | £327.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271.67k | £277.80k | £292.87k | £337.95k | £312.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £273.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 17 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 13 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1995, 12TH JUNE 1998 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER, OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS, IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY, BEXLEY AND GREENWICH AND LEWISHAM, MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY AND KENT COUNTY COUNCIL, BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY OR PAID ADVOCATES TO SUPPORT THOSE PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY, BEXLEY AND GREENWICH AND LEWISHAM, MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY AND KENT COUNTY COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window