Governing document BENGEO PLAYGROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 1992, 23 JUNE 1993, 31 JANUARY 1994, 4 MAY 1994 AND 25 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ACCORDING TO THE HIGHEST PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS THE EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN UNDER COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING A STIMULATING AND SAFE ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH CHILDREN MAY DEVELOP SOCIALLY INTELLECTUALLY PHYSICALLY AND EMOTIONALLY THUS LAYING A SUITABLE FOUNDATION FOR EVENTUAL TRANSISTION TO THE INFANTS SCHOOL
Area of benefit
THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.