AFRICAN AIDS CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Governance
- 25 September 1995: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN AFRICA IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN AFRICA SUFFERING FROM ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) AND HUMAN IMMUNE DEFIECIENCY VIRUS (HIV) OR RELATED CONDITIONS BY ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF LABORATORIES AND CLINICS FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF MEDICINES IN AFRICA AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window