FRIENDS OF WILLINGTON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raffles and Fetes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 26 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Roper-Robinson | Chair | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Moran | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dalveen Sandhu | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/09/2020 | 26/09/2021 | 26/09/2022 | 26/09/2023 | 26/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.12k | £10.78k | £10.78k | £10.79k | £9.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £5.24k | £5.24k | £8.28k | £12.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 September 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2020 | 18 September 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willington Primary School
Trent Avenue
Willington
DERBY
DE65 6DN
- Phone:
- 01283702156
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window