CENTRE FOR WORLD EVANGELISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Kingdom of God through proclamation of the Gospel of Christ, discipleship, social and community action. Training & equipping Christians for the work of ministry, youth and children ministry disabled & elderly, homeless and vulnerable people, media, music, performing arts and publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Croydon
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF REV DR ISAAC FERGUSON DANSO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CLARA DANSO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DANNY WELBECK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.74k | £42.98k | £44.11k | £44.08k | £27.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.01k | £47.45k | £37.45k | £46.08k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROPAGATION AND PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. (B) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
41 Church Road
Croydon
CR0 1SG
- Phone:
- 02086679504
- Email:
- president@centreforworld.org
- Website:
-
centreforworld.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window