KETTERING CAT WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising collections etc held on a small scale and we try to educate the community on cat welfare, neutering etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Richardson | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA BRIGSTOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACEY KAREN KONARCZAK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £1.53k | £451 | £2.96k | £920 | |
|
Total expenditure | £635 | £1.67k | £2.04k | £1.53k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCE, ILL USAGE OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES AND FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CATS AND IN PARTICULAR: (A)TO RESCUE ABANDONED CATS AND KITTENS, TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, SHELTER AND VETERINARY ATTENTION. (B)TO RE-HOME STRAY AND UNWANTED CATS AND KITTENS IN HOMES SUITED TO THEIR INDIVIDUAL NEEDS. (C)BY NEUTERING AND SPAYING, THE KETTERING CAT WELFARE WILL LIMIT THE NUMBER OF UNWANTED CATS AND KITTENS. (D)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE WELFARE OF CATS.
Area of benefit
KETTERING AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 NORTHAMPTON ROAD
KETTERING
NN15 7LA
- Phone:
- 07508681029
- Email:
- lisabrigstock@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window