N SETHIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are: a) the relief of the sick, elderly, disabled, destitute and of orphans b) the advancement of education, and c) the advancement of religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 27 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIRMAL KUMAR SETHIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lord Ara Darzi | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
ARUN BHATTACHARYA | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amrao Jain | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHA SETHIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £536.36k | £487.21k | £76.32k | £218.16k | £62.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.84k | £144.16k | £18.94k | £74.18k | £2.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £536.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £31 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £55.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 22 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
(I) RELIEF OF THE SICK ELDERLY DISABLED DESTITUTE AND OF ORPHANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION MEDICINES MEDICINAL TREATMENT AND CARE AND MAINTENANCE AND ANY OTHER ASSISTANCE REQUIRED FOR THEIR WELFARE. (II) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (ACADEMIC AND PHYSICAL) INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE GRANT SCHOLARSHIPS TUITION FEES AND BURSARIES AND THE PROVISION OF AND ASSISTANCE IN AQUIRING BUILDING REPAIRING AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOLS BUILDINGS LECTURE AND ASSEMBLY HALLS HOSTELS AND GYMNASIUMS. (III) ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION INCLUDING THE MAKING OF FINANCIAL GIFTS TO TT DEVASTAMAMS A RELIGIOUS CHARITY REGISTERED IN INDIA TO FINANCE THAT CHARITY'S CONSTRUCTION OF A TEMPLE AS WELL AS ITS OTHER CHARITABLE AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES AND INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
N SETHIA HOUSE
105 ST JOHN STREET
LONDON
EC1M 4AS
- Phone:
- 0207 814 9014
- Email:
- Amrao@sethia-london.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window