WEST SILVERTOWN VILLAGE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates Britannia Village Hall including children's play area. Runs and supports community activities. Distributes free newsletter locally about charity/voluntary activities. Assists local community with consultation on planning and social issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£721,758
Donations and legacies | £356.77k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £212.68k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £152.31k |
Total expenditure:
£801,471
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £801.47k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £200,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £801.47k |
People

18 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newham
Governance
- 28 September 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Tulloch | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Courtney | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupesh Bhudia | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oleksandr Pavlov | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Davies | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Ashfauvzzaman Khan | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zeeshan Ahmed | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDNA CHIRWA | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEE HYEOK LEE | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462.70k | £489.22k | £737.26k | £873.61k | £721.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.12k | £404.59k | £721.29k | £866.82k | £801.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £412.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.84k | £159.40k | £215.00k | £412.00k | £200.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £374.47k | £508.69k | £356.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £212.68k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £194.51k | £189.02k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £168.29k | £175.90k | £152.31k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £721.29k | £866.82k | £801.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.88k | £2.88k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £99.78k | £89.12k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £14.39k | £11.69k | £6.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £602.09k | £647.26k | £483.74k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £94.71k | £130.38k | £41.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 2004 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THAT PART OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM COMPRISED IN WEST SILVERTOWN AND ITS ENVIRONS BY; (1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (2) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AMONG INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (4) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS (5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION IN LIFE (6) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, ARCHITECTURE AND SOCIAL PROVISION IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT (7) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL ENVIRONMENT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN WHICH THEY LIVE.
Area of benefit
WEST SILVERTOWN AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Britannia Village Trust
The Britannia Village Hall
65 Evelyn Road
LONDON
E16 1TU
- Phone:
- 02075116118
- Email:
- hello@wsfroyaldocks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window