SHENSTONE DAY CARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides day care, refreshments and social and health promotion activities for frail older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 September 1995: Standard registration
- FRIDAY FRIENDS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lynne Young | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Marilyn Shorey | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Strub | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RITA Hancocks | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.44k | £1.54k | £4.47k | £11.00k | £13.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.95k | £851 | £5.97k | £10.87k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.88k | N/A | N/A | £1.90k | £3.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE WARD AND PARISH OF SHENSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mayfield
The Old Stables
Court Drive
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS14 0JQ
- Phone:
- 01543480158
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window