Trustees COMMUNITY COUNSELLING
Charity number: 1049519

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damian Castello | Chair | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Will Buckley | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadayna Alexander-Johnson | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Remedios | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne O'Connor | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Spyrou | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Caroline Jane Hawes | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Foxcroft | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Higgs | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Patricia Anderson | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Margaret Williams | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LOVA RAJAONARIMANANA | Trustee | 14 December 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.