TAVISTOCK AND PORTMAN CHARITABLE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity are research relating to the Clinics' services; the Tavistock Society of Psychotherapists; and smaller projects for the welfare of patients, staff and trainees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 1997: Standard registration
- 10 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.90k | £86.95k | £199.22k | £32.36k | £43.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.04k | £92.10k | £94.00k | £35.34k | £41.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26/03/1997 as amended on 28 Apr 2020 as amended on 21 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
The prevention, relief, treatment and cure of sickness, ill health and infirmity of every kind in the field of mental health and the promotion of well-being and, in particular, but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing the furtherance or support of the work of the Tavistock and Portman NHS Foundation Trust in any ways which shall for the time being be charitable in law.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 16 August 1997 : Standard registration
- 10 August 2023 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window