CITY OF PETERBOROUGH SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1049573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The orchestra is established to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of orchestral music in all its aspects by the presentation of public concerts. We generally perform 3 concerts per year at various venues round and about Peterborough, either on our own or in partnership with other musical societies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £13,656
Total expenditure: £14,122

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CPSO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEIRDRE MARY CULLOTY Chair 02 July 2017
None on record
Kate Wishart Trustee 05 November 2024
None on record
GRAHAM HEALEY Trustee 02 July 2017
None on record
Stephen Osborn Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £13.52k £9.08k £3.30k £14.25k £13.66k
Total expenditure £15.70k £7.61k £3.90k £15.58k £14.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 November 2020 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Cross Lane
Aldwincle
KETTERING
NN14 3EG
Phone:
07932345097